EP0089910 - Automotive cross-country vehicle with variable geometrical frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.1984 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.1984 [1984/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states van den Berg, Christian 63, avenue du Général de Gaulle Cadaujac F-33140 Pont de la Maye / FR | [1983/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/39] | Representative(s) | Thébault, Jean-Louis SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/39] | Thébault, Jean-Louis Cabinet Thébault S.A. 1 Allées de Chartres F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 83450006.8 | 11.03.1983 | [1983/39] | Priority number, date | FR19820004367 | 12.03.1982 Original published format: FR 8204367 | [1983/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0089910 | Date: | 28.09.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B62D61/10, B62D21/18 | [1983/39] | CPC: |
B62D21/186 (EP);
B62D61/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1983/39] | Title | German: | Selbstfahrendes Geländefahrzeug mit veränderlichem geometrischen Rahmen | [1983/39] | English: | Automotive cross-country vehicle with variable geometrical frame | [1983/39] | French: | Engin automobile tous terrains à ossature porteuse à géométrie variable | [1983/39] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 29.05.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/49] | 26.06.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2307694 ; | [A]FR2285287 ; | [A]US4099733 ; | [A]US4207956 ; | [A]US4187923 ; | [A]US3349931 |