EP0113306 - Machine for automatically introducing seals into sectional bars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1989 [1989/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andreazza, Jean-Yves Corme Royal F-17600 Saujon / FR | [1984/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/28] | Representative(s) | Thébault, Jean-Louis SCHMIT CHRETIEN 111, cours du Médoc 33300 Bordeaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/28] | Thébault, Jean-Louis Cabinet Thébault S.A. 1 Allées de Chartres F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 83450030.8 | 22.12.1983 | [1984/28] | Priority number, date | FR19820022163 | 29.12.1982 Original published format: FR 8222163 | [1984/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0113306 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0113306 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B23P19/04, E04F21/00 | [1984/28] | CPC: |
B23P19/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT [1984/28] | Title | German: | Gerät zum automatischen Einführen einer Dichtung in einen Profilstab | [1984/28] | English: | Machine for automatically introducing seals into sectional bars | [1984/28] | French: | Machine à poser les joints automatiquement dans les profilés | [1984/28] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/10] | 20.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3335487 [ ]; | FR2411154 [ ]; | US3295195 [ ] |