EP0098790 - Device for hermetically closing load cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1987 [1987/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA AB S-721 83 Västeras / SE | [1984/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sture, Siby Violstigen 11A S-72227 Västeras / SE | [1984/03] | Representative(s) | Boecker, Joachim Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 83710041.1 | 22.06.1983 | [1984/03] | Priority number, date | SE19820004072 | 01.07.1982 Original published format: SE 8204072 | [1984/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098790 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098790 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/26, G01L5/00 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
C22F1/186 (EP,US);
G01L1/26 (EP,US);
Y10S376/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/03] | Title | German: | Anordnung für hermetisch zu verschliessende Lastzellen | [1984/03] | English: | Device for hermetically closing load cells | [1984/03] | French: | Dispositif pour des cellules de charge à sceller hermétiquement | [1984/03] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 27.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.03.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1125205 ; | [AD]US3168826 (JURGEN PAETOW); | [AD]US3303450 (BRACKETT JR ANTHONY H, et al); | [A]DE1648700 (SIEMENS AG) |