EP0099850 - Novel carbacyclin esters, process for the preparation thereof, and their use as medicinal agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skuballa, Werner, Dr. Olwenstrasse 23 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 02 /
Radüchel, Bernd, Dr. Gollanczstrasse 132 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 03 /
Vorbrüggen, Helmut, Prof. Dr. Wilkestrasse 7 D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | 04 /
Mannesmann-Varchmin, Gerda, Dr. Sachsenring 22-24 D-5000 Köln / DE | 05 /
Nieuweboer, Bob Bärbelweg 16 D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | 06 /
Town, Michael-Harold, Dr. Buchsbaumweg 3 D-1000 Berlin 47 / DE | [1984/05] | Application number, filing date | 83730052.4 | 27.05.1983 | [1984/05] | Priority number, date | DE19823221193 | 28.05.1982 Original published format: DE 3221193 | [1984/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0099850 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099850 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C405/00, C07C69/66, A61K31/557, A61K31/215 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
C07C405/0083 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/05] | C07C177/00, C07C69/66, A61K31/557, A61K31/215 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/05] | Title | German: | Carbacyclinester, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung in der Medizin | [1984/05] | English: | Novel carbacyclin esters, process for the preparation thereof, and their use as medicinal agents | [1984/05] | French: | Esters de carbacycline, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation en médecine | [1984/05] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1983 | Examination requested [1984/05] | 13.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/50] | Request for further processing for: | 04.06.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.12.1991 | SE | 18.12.1991 | LU | 31.05.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/46] | AT | 18.12.1991 | |
SE | 18.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/28] | SE | 18.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | US3979440 [ ] (MOROZOWICH WALTER); | GB2014143 [ ] (UPJOHN CO) |