EP0084521 - Electrolytic cell for metal recovery and its operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1987 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1987 [1987/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blake, Colin Charles 23 Sutton Road Rochford Essex / GB | 02 /
Goodall, Charles Clifford Owen 2 Inverness Drive Hainault, Ilford, Essex / GB | [1983/30] | Application number, filing date | 83810013.9 | 13.01.1983 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | GB19820001367 | 19.01.1982 Original published format: GB 8201367 | GB19820007061 | 11.03.1982 Original published format: GB 8207061 | [1983/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0084521 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0084521 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084521 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C25C7/06, C25C7/08 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
C25C7/06 (EP,US);
C25C7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/30] | Title | German: | Elektrolytische Metallrückgewinnungszelle und deren Betrieb | [1983/30] | English: | Electrolytic cell for metal recovery and its operation | [1983/30] | French: | Cellule électrolytique pour la récupération de métaux et son fonctionnement | [1983/30] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/30] | 18.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]EP0058537 (NAT RES DEV [GB]); | [Y]FR2276402 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [AD]US1535577 (WYLD CLEAVE ARTHUR HAROLD) |