EP0088721 - Method of detecting the interruption of the transmission of light signals, and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 12.04.1989 [1989/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABLOPTIC S.A. Rue François-Borel CH-2016 Cortaillod / CH | [1983/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiedmer, Jean-Pierre 27, chemin des Polonais CH-2016 Cortaillod / CH | [1983/37] | Representative(s) | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Moser & Cie C/o Cabinet Roland Nithardt Y-Parc/Chemin de la Sallaz 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Moser & Cie, c/o Cabinet Roland Nithardt, Y-Parc/Chemin de la Sallaz CH-1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH | Application number, filing date | 83810053.5 | 08.02.1983 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | CH19820001258 | 02.03.1982 Original published format: CH 125882 | [1983/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0088721 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088721 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/12, G08B13/18 | [1983/37] | CPC: |
G08B13/128 (EP,US);
G08B13/186 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Detektieren der Unterbrechung der Übertragung von Lichtsignalen und Vorrichtung dafür | [1983/37] | English: | Method of detecting the interruption of the transmission of light signals, and apparatus therefor | [1983/37] | French: | Procédé pour détecter l'interruption de la transmission de signaux lumineux et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1983/37] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/39] | 30.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.1986 | SE | 31.05.1986 | [1989/15] |
Former [1987/20] | AT | 14.05.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3714644 (HELLSTROM H); | [X]GB1497995 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [A]GB2044971 (CHUBB ELECTRONICS LTD) |