EP0092512 - Process for trichromatic dyeing or printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1987 [1987/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaetzer, Harry Waldmattstrasse 39 D-7867 Wehr 2 / DE | 02 /
Raisin, Helmut Im Baumgarten 9 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 03 /
Mäusezahl, Dieter, Dr. Langgartenstrasse 19 CH-4105 Biel-Benken / CH | [1983/43] | Application number, filing date | 83810135.0 | 31.03.1983 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | CH19820002206 | 08.04.1982 Original published format: CH 220682 | [1983/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092512 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092512 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | D06P3/06, C09B67/22 | [1983/43] | CPC: |
D06P3/06 (EP,US);
C09B67/0041 (EP,US);
Y10S534/01 (EP,US);
Y10S8/924 (US);
Y10S8/929 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1983/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Trichromie-Färben oder -Bedrucken | [1983/43] | English: | Process for trichromatic dyeing or printing | [1983/43] | French: | Procédé de teinture ou d'impression en trois couleurs | [1983/43] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 13.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH543634 ; | [Y]FR2096429 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [Y]US3713768 (WEGMULLER H, et al); | [A]DE2924661 (BAYER AG); | [Y]EP0030919 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0042357 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]DE3111277 (SNIA VISCOSA [IT]); | [YP]EP0058139 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |