EP0098239 - Wrist watch with a strap hinged to the case [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 02.01.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA S.A., Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | [1984/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mock, Elmar Rue des Tilles 353 CH-2603 Pery / CH | 02 /
Bron, Alphonse Rue des Sports CH-2854 Bassecourt / CH | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Gresset, Jean, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Fbg de l'Hôpital 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | Gresset, Jean, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [1984/02] | Gresset, Jean ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 83810210.1 | 17.05.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | CH19820003620 | 11.06.1982 Original published format: CH 362082 | [1984/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098239 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098239 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/16, G04B37/22 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
G04B37/1486 (EP,US);
A44C5/14 (EP,US);
G04B37/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/02] | Title | German: | Armbanduhr mit einem mittels eines Scharnieres an dem Gehäuse befestigten Band | [1984/02] | English: | Wrist watch with a strap hinged to the case | [1984/02] | French: | Montre-bracelet dont le bracelet est attaché au boîtier de montre par une charnière | [1984/02] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/23] | 02.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.05.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.1987
21.09.1987
ADMISSIBLE Piranha Marketing GmbH Birkenweiherstrasse 2 D-6456 Langenselbold / DE Opponent's representative Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, et al, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | 02
13.10.1987
28.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE Junghans Uhren GmbH Geisshaldenstrasse D-78713 Schramberg / DE Opponent's representative Hofmann, Gerhard Patentassessor Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.1987
21.09.1987
ADMISSIBLE Piranha Marketing GmbH Birkenweiherstrasse 2 D-6456 Langenselbold / DE Opponent's representative Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al, et al Patentanwalt Salzstrasse 11 a Postfach 21 44 D-63411 Hanau / DE | ||
02
13.10.1987
28.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE Junghans Uhren GmbH Geisshaldenstrasse D-78713 Schramberg / DE Opponent's representative Hofmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentassessor Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | |||
Former [1987/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.1987
Piranha Marketing GmbH Birkenweiherstrasse 2 D-6456 Langenselbold / DE Opponent's representative Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al, et al Patentanwälte Strasse & Stoffregen Salzstrasse 11a Postfach 2144 D-63411 Hanau / DE | ||
02
13.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE Junghans Uhren GmbH Geisshaldenstrasse D-78713 Schramberg / DE Opponent's representative Hofmann, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentassessor Stephanstrasse 49 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | |||
Former [1987/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.08.1987
Piranha Marketing GmbH Birkenweiherstrasse 2 D-6456 Langenselbold / DE Opponent's representative Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al, et al Patentanwälte Strasse & Stoffregen Salzstrasse 11a Postfach 2144 D-63411 Hanau / DE | 18.11.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.04.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.04.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.04.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.12.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1992/08] | Appeal following opposition | 10.10.1994 | Appeal received No. J0003/95 | 14.12.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.05.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: rejection of appeal | 25.05.1990 | Appeal received No. T0456/90 | 23.08.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.11.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 25.06.1993 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1993/26] | 25.08.1993 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1993/35] | 25.09.1996 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1996/39] | 29.11.1996 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1996/48] | 28.02.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.03.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 07.02.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.1994 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CH405170 (OMEGA BRANDT & FRERES SA LOUIS [CH]); | [A]FR1578023 ; | [A]FR2050514 (SAKATA WATCH CO LTD [JP]); | [A]CH545504 ; | [AD]FR2251291 (CLAUDE GEORGES [CH]); | [A]FR2302557 (SOPRODIF SA [FR]); | [A]US4307824 (MALAMOUD JEAN G) |