EP0131082 - Device for placing pallets on a loading area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1988 [1988/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FABRIQUES DE TABAC REUNIES S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 P.O. Box 11 2003 Neuchâtel-Serrières / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | For all designated states FABRIQUES DE TABAC REUNIES S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 P.O. Box 11 CH-2003 Neuchâtel-Serrières / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Maurice Chemin des Polonais 43 CH-2016 Cortaillod / CH | 02 /
Bernasconi, Jean-François Landions 6 CH-2016 Cortaillod/NE / CH | [1985/03] | Representative(s) | Rochat, Daniel Jean, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | Rochat, Daniel Jean, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 83810308.3 | 06.07.1983 | [1985/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131082 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131082 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B65G57/00, B65G7/08, B65G65/00 | [1985/03] | CPC: |
B65G65/00 (EP,US);
B65G57/00 (EP,US);
B65G7/08 (EP,US);
Y10S414/106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Stellen von Paletten auf einen Ladeplatz | [1985/03] | English: | Device for placing pallets on a loading area | [1985/03] | French: | Dispositif de placement de palettes sur une aire de chargement | [1985/03] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1984 | Examination requested [1985/03] | 05.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 03.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1038472 [ ] (SCHLOSSER & CO GMBH); | FR2207076 [ ] (RIBES RENE [FR]); | US4119214 [ ] (BLOM ROLLAND D) |