EP0100752 - Process for the preparation of a rabies vaccine, holder and means for its administration and process for oral immunisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veterinär-Bakteriologisches Institut der Universität Bern Länggass-Strasse 122 CH-3012 Bern / CH | [1984/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steck, Franz, Prof. Dr. Eichholzstrasse 121 CH-3084 Wabern / CH | [1984/07] | Representative(s) | Braun, André sr., et al A. Braun, Braun, Héritier, Eschmann AG Patentanwälte Holbeinstrasse 36-38 CH-4051 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/07] | Braun, André, et al A. Braun, Braun, Héritier, Eschmann AG Patentanwälte Holbeinstrasse 36-38 CH-4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 83810344.8 | 02.08.1983 | [1984/07] | Priority number, date | CH19820004699 | 04.08.1982 Original published format: CH 469982 | [1984/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0100752 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0100752 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/205, C12N7/08 | [1984/07] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/205 (EP);
A61K2039/5254 (EP);
A61K2039/542 (EP);
A61K2039/552 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1984/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines neuen Tollwut-Impfstoffs, Behälter und Mittel zu dessen Verabreichung und Verfahren zur oralen Immunisierung | [1984/07] | English: | Process for the preparation of a rabies vaccine, holder and means for its administration and process for oral immunisation | [1984/07] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un vaccin contre la rage, support et moyen pour l'administrer et procédé d'immunisation orale | [1984/07] | File destroyed: | 10.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 18.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/24] | 15.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.10.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2378859 ; | [X]US4014991 ; | [Y]US3769415 | [XP] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 76, (1983) Zusammenfassung 42303. J. BLANCOU et al: "Studies on pathogenic, immunogenic and protective efficienccy of fox rabies virus before and after adaptation to cell culture. Application to vaccination against rabies"; & CAN. J. MICROBIOL 29(1): 77-831983 | [X] - N.T.I.S. Techn. Notes, Januar 1977NTN-77/0019. "Oral Rabies Immunization of Wild Carnivores" | [X] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 62, 1976Zusammenfassung 28527. WINKLER et al: "Rabies immunization of red foxes (Vulpes fulca) with vaccine in sausage baits"; & AM J. EPIDEMIOL 103(4): 408-415. 1976 | [Y] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 70, 1980, Zusammenfassung 37308. J. BLACK et al: "The safety and efficacy of immunizing foxes (Vulpes vulpes) using bait containing attenuated rabies virus vaccine"; & CAN. J. COMP. MED. 44(2): 169-1761980 |