EP0134375 - Device for for operating and air jet loom and loom equipped with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.1985 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK SULZER-RÜTI AG CH-8630 Rüti (Zürich) / CH | [1985/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riboli, Gianni Speerstrasse 2 CH-8637 Laupen / CH | 02 /
Willam, Manfred Bogenackerstrasse 33 CH-8630 Tann-Rüti / CH | [1985/12] | Representative(s) | Wall, Erich, et al Gebrüder Sulzer AG KSR/Patente 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/12] | Wall, Erich, Dr., et al Gebrüder Sulzer AG KSR/Patente CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 83810379.4 | 24.08.1983 | [1985/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0134375 | Date: | 20.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/30 | [1985/12] | CPC: |
D03D47/304 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, LI [1985/20] |
Former [1985/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren für den Betrieb einer Luftstrahlwebmaschine und Webmaschine zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1985/12] | English: | Device for for operating and air jet loom and loom equipped with such a device | [1985/12] | French: | Dispositif pour faire fonctionner un métier à jet d'air et métier pourvu d'un tel dispositif | [1985/12] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 26.08.1983 | Examination requested [1985/12] | 25.10.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | 27.03.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.08.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 24.08.1984 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 24.08.1984 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 24.08.1984 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 24.08.1984 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 24.08.1984 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 24.08.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 24.08.1984 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 24.08.1984 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4245677 [ ]; | DE2051445 [ ]; | DE2328135 [ ] |