EP0108708 - N-(cyclopropyl-triazinyl- and -pyrimidinyl)-N'-(arylsulfonyl) ureas with herbicidal activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szczepanski, Henry, Dr. Bodenmatt CH-4323 Wallbach / CH | [1984/20] | Application number, filing date | 83810443.8 | 03.10.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | CH19820005874 | 06.10.1982 Original published format: CH 587482 | [1984/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108708 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108708 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108708 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/36, C07D251/16, C07D251/18, C07D251/20, C07D251/22, C07D251/24, C07D239/46, C07D239/42 | [1984/20] | CPC: |
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
A01N47/36 (EP,US);
C07C45/455 (EP,US);
C07D251/16 (EP,US);
C07D251/18 (EP,US);
C07D251/20 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/455, C07C49/293 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/20] | Title | German: | N-(Cyclopropyl-triazinyl- und -pyrimidinyl)-N'-(arylsulfonyl)harnstoffe mit herbizider Wirkung | [1984/20] | English: | N-(cyclopropyl-triazinyl- and -pyrimidinyl)-N'-(arylsulfonyl) ureas with herbicidal activity | [1984/20] | French: | N-(cyclopropyl-triazinyl- et -pyrimidinyl)-N'-(arylsulfonyl) urées à activité herbicide | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 29.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3441560 (ZIMMERMANN MARKUS); | [A]EP0030141 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0044807 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0056969 (NIHON TOKUSHU NOYAKU SEIZO KK [JP]) |