EP0106805 - Process for the preparation of 3,4,9,10-tetrathioperylene and 3,4,9,10-tetraselenoperylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1987 [1987/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/17] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayer, Carl Walter, Dr. Niederholzboden 55 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1984/17] | Application number, filing date | 83810459.4 | 06.10.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | CH19820005962 | 12.10.1982 Original published format: CH 596282 | [1984/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0106805 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0106805 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D495/06, C07D517/06, // (C07D495/06, 339:00, 339:00),(C07D517/06, 345:00, 345:00) | [1984/17] | CPC: |
C07D495/06 (EP,US);
C07D517/06 (EP,US);
C07D517/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1984/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 3,4,9,10-Tetrathioperylen und 3,4,9,10-Tetraselenoperylen | [1984/17] | English: | Process for the preparation of 3,4,9,10-tetrathioperylene and 3,4,9,10-tetraselenoperylene | [1984/17] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 3,4,9,10-tétrathiopérylène et 3,4,9,10-tétrasélénopérylène | [1984/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 08.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 13.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | - SOLID STATE COMMUNICATIONS, Band 38, Nr. 12, 1981, Seiten 1129-1134, Pergamon Press Ltd., GB. B. HILTI et al.: "3,4,9,10 - Tetrathioperylene - I 1.28' A new highly conducting, incommensurate organic charge transfer salt" |