EP0096013 - Salts of erythromycin showing a combined therapeutic activity, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical formulations containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1987 [1987/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NUOVO CONSORZIO SANITARIO NAZIONALE Via Svetonio 6 00136 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/49] | For all designated states NUOVO CONSORZIO SANITARIO NAZIONALE Via Svetonio 6 I-00136 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casini, Giovanni, Prof Via Caldarola 45/62i I-70100 Bari / IT | [1983/49] | Representative(s) | Bazzichelli, Alfredo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/49] | Bazzichelli, Alfredo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 I-00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 83830098.6 | 18.05.1983 | [1983/49] | Priority number, date | IT19820048539 | 28.05.1982 Original published format: IT 4853982 | [1983/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096013 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096013 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08, A61K31/70, C07C149/23 | [1983/49] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/49] | Title | German: | Erythromycin-Salze mit kombinierter therapeutischer Aktivität, Verfahren zu ihren Herstellung und die sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1983/49] | English: | Salts of erythromycin showing a combined therapeutic activity, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical formulations containing them | [1983/49] | French: | Sels d'érythromycine à activité thérapeutique combinée, leurs procédés de préparation et les formulations pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1983/49] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 21.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/29] | Request for further processing for: | 30.08.1985 | Request for further processing filed | 27.08.1985 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.09.1985 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2427821 (PROTER SPA [IT]); | [Y]EP0035770 (INTERX RESEARCH CORP [US]); | [YP]EP0052909 (REINER ALBERTO & C REAL SAS [IT]) | Examination | - Farmaco, Ed. Prat., Vol. 33(a), pages 379-391, 1978 |