EP0099863 - Improved device to bundle rolled bars or rolled sections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.09.1987 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1987 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.10.1987 [1987/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | For all designated states DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.p.A. Via Nazionale, 19 I-33042 Buttrio (UD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gigante, Sergio Via Mantova, 86/3 I-33100 Udine / IT | [1984/05] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/25] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | ||
Former [1984/05] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 83830114.1 | 08.06.1983 | [1984/05] | Priority number, date | IT19820083420 | 09.07.1982 Original published format: IT 8342082 | [1984/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0099863 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099863 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65G57/18 | [1984/05] | CPC: |
B65G57/183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/05] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Bündeln von Walzstäben oder Walzprofilen | [1984/05] | English: | Improved device to bundle rolled bars or rolled sections | [1984/05] | French: | Dispositif de mise en paquets de barres laminées ou profilés laminés | [1984/05] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/23] | 21.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.08.1986
09.09.1986
ADMISSIBLE SMS Schloemann-Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Gerd, et al, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 D-57072 Siegen / DE | [1986/42] | 09.10.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.01.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.01.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 06.03.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 21.05.1987 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 01.06.1987 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1987/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1183020 (SCHLOEMANN AG); | [A]DE1235811 (MOELLER & NEUMANN VERWALT GES, et al); | [A]DE1258796 (DAVY & UNITED ENG CO LTD); | [A]DE1296578 (SECIM CORBEVOIE); | [A]FR2156307 (MORGAN CONSTRUCTION CO); | [A]EP0009037 (ELINEAU HUBERT) |