EP0121031 - Modular elements building structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Granieri, Luigi I-06050 Pantalla Perugia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states Granieri, Luigi I-06050 Pantalla Perugia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | ||
Former [1984/41] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio FERRARIO Via Collina, 36 I-00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 83830260.2 | 07.12.1983 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | IT19830047988 | 24.03.1983 Original published format: IT 4798883 | [1984/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0121031 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121031 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/04, E04B1/06 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
E04B1/06 (EP);
E04B1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/41] | Title | German: | Gebäude mit Modulelementen | [1984/41] | English: | Modular elements building structure | [1984/41] | French: | Bâtiment utilisant des éléments modulaires | [1984/41] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/28] | 22.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.06.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2924962 (CLARENCE NETTLE LAWRENCE); | [A]FR1234765 (ENTPR R COCUAUD & CIE); | [A]FR1565754 ; | [A]FR2439848 (VALETTE NICOLE) |