EP0114582 - Rim for a household appliance work top [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1985 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDESIT INDUSTRIA ELETTRODOMESTICI ITALIANA S.p.A. Str. Piossasco Km 17 I-10040 Rivalta Turin / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states INDESIT INDUSTRIA ELETTRODOMESTICI ITALIANA S.p.A. Str. Piossasco Km 17 I-10040 Rivalta Turin / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Premoli, Marcello Corso Palestro 6 I-10122 Torino / IT | 02 /
Morone, Giuseppe Via Montebello 23 I-10124 Torino / IT | 03 /
Manzo, Pietro Via Carotti 15 I-12032 Barge (Cuneo) / IT | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 83830273.5 | 21.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | IT19820068517 | 24.12.1982 Original published format: IT 6851782 | [1984/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114582 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0114582 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A47B77/02, D06F39/12 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
A47L15/4251 (EP,US);
A47B77/022 (EP);
D06F39/12 (EP,US);
A47B2200/0004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1984/31] | Title | German: | Rahmen für die Arbeitsfläche eines Haushaltsgeräts | [1984/31] | English: | Rim for a household appliance work top | [1984/31] | French: | Cadre pour un plan de travail d'un appareil ménager | [1984/31] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/14] | 09.11.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]LU47825 ; | [Y]US3697147 (SCHULTE DONALD W); | [A]US3773399 (SULCEK C); | [A]US3820296 (BEBINGER J); | [A]FR2393549 (THOMSON BRANDT [FR]); | [A]GB2065460 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE); | [Y]GB2071706 (HOTPOINT LTD) |