EP0087402 - Instrument for obtaining samples from uterus of animals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.1988 [1988/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nydahl, Claes Nya Valsätravägen 19 S-752 46 Uppsala / SE | [1983/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nydahl, Claes Nya Valsätravägen 19 S-752 46 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
Knudsen, Odd Dragarbrunnsgatan 7 S-753 32 Uppsala / SE | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Bjellman, Lennart Olov Henrik, et al DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB Box 1344 751 43 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | Bjellman, Lennart Olov Henrik, et al DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB Box 1344 S-751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 83850028.8 | 04.02.1983 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | SE19820001017 | 18.02.1982 Original published format: SE 8201017 | [1983/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087402 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087402 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087402 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
A61B10/0291 (EP,US);
A61B10/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erlangung von Uterusproben von Tieren | [1983/35] | English: | Instrument for obtaining samples from uterus of animals | [1983/35] | French: | Instrument pour obtenir des prélèvements de l'utérus d'animaux | [1983/35] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/35] | 20.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4227537 (SUCIU THOMAS N, et al); | [A]GB1158159 (HOLLISTER INC [US]); | [AD]US3961620 (SCHACK COLIN B, et al); | [A]FR2248012 (MARTINEZ JACQUES [FR]); | [A]US4027658 (MARSHALL MANLY ERNEST); | [AD]US3777743 (BINARD W, et al) |