EP0090782 - Flyback DC/DC converter with low ripple in the output capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON Patent and Trademark Department 126 25 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON Patent and Trademark Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Assow, Bengt Holger Storskiftesväg 66 S-145 60 Norsborg / SE | 02 /
Jansson, Curt Evert Lingvägen 198 S-123 59 Farsta / SE | 03 /
Rolleberg, Kjell Ove Ragangen 133 S-145 60 Norsborg / SE | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 83850065.0 | 16.03.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | SE19820001916 | 25.03.1982 Original published format: SE 8201916 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0090782 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0090782 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/14, H02M3/155 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
H02M3/155 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1983/40] | Title | German: | Gleichstrom-Gleichstrom-Sperrwandler mit niedriger Welligkeit im Ausgangskondensator | [1983/40] | English: | Flyback DC/DC converter with low ripple in the output capacitor | [1983/40] | French: | Convertisseur continu-continu à oscillateur bloqué avec ondulation faible dans le condensateur de sortie | [1983/40] | File destroyed: | 07.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 06.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 20.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2851095 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]US4257087 (CUK SLOBODAN M); | [A]US4262328 (BLOOM GORDON E, et al); | [A]US4274133 (CUK SLOBODAN M, et al) |