EP0091892 - A milking method and an apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.09.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA-LAVAL AB Box 500 147 00 Tumba / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/42] | For all designated states ALFA-LAVAL AB Box 500 S-147 00 Tumba / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jakobson, Sten Klockarvägen 39 S-151 61 Södertälje / SE | 02 /
Rabold, Karl Wackershofen 6 D-7170 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [1983/42] | Representative(s) | Ellner, Lars O., et al AWAPATENT AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Ellner, Lars O., et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1990/21] | Ellner, Lars O. Awapatent AB Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1983/42] | Nordén, Ake Oscar Grahn Patentbyra AB Box 19540 S-104 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 83850086.6 | 29.03.1983 | [1983/42] | Priority number, date | SE19820002278 | 08.04.1982 Original published format: SE 8202278 | [1983/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0091892 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0091892 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0091892 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/12 | [1983/42] | CPC: |
A01K1/12 (EP,US);
A01J5/013 (EP,US);
A01J5/0175 (EP,US);
A01J7/04 (EP,US);
A01K1/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/42] | Title | German: | Melkverfahren und Gerät dafür | [1983/42] | English: | A milking method and an apparatus therefor | [1983/42] | French: | Procédé de traite et son appareillage | [1983/42] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/26] | 03.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.06.1989
16.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL Opponent's representative ten Cate, Walter Enno Maria Octrooibureau van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | 02
01.08.1989
05.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Gascoigne-Melotte B.V. Postbus 1068 NL-8300 BB Emmeloord / NL Opponent's representative de Bruijn, Leendert C. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | 03
02.08.1989
23.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE Multinorm B.V. Hoofdweg 1278 NL-2153 LR Nieuw Vennep / NL Opponent's representative van der Beek, George F. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.06.1989
16.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL Opponent's representative ten Cate, Walter Enno Maria, Mr. Drs. Octrooibureau van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | ||
02
01.08.1989
05.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Gascoigne-Melotte B.V. Postbus 1068 NL-8300 BB Emmeloord / NL Opponent's representative de Bruijn, Leendert C. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | |||
03
02.08.1989
23.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE Multinorm B.V. Hoofdweg 1278 NL-2153 LR Nieuw Vennep / NL Opponent's representative van der Beek, George Frans, Ir. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | |||
Former [1989/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.06.1989
C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL Opponent's representative ten Cate, Walter Enno Maria, Mr. Drs. Octrooibureau van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | ||
02
01.08.1989
05.10.1989
ADMISSIBLE Gascoigne-Melotte B.V. Postbus 1068 NL-8300 BB Emmeloord / NL Opponent's representative de Bruijn, Leendert C. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | |||
03
02.08.1989
23.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE Multinorm B.V. Hoofdweg 1278 NL-2153 LR Nieuw Vennep / NL Opponent's representative Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [1989/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.06.1989
C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL Opponent's representative ten Cate, Walter Enno Maria, Mr. Drs. Octrooibureau van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | ||
02
01.08.1989
Gascoigne-Melotte B.V. Postbus 1068 NL-8300 BB Emmeloord / NL | |||
03
02.08.1989
Multinorm B.V. Hoofdweg 1278 NL-2153 LR Nieuw Vennep / NL Opponent's representative Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | |||
Former [1989/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.06.1989
ADMISSIBLE C. van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL Opponent's representative ten Cate, Walter Enno Maria, Mr. Drs. Octrooibureau van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 NL-3155 PD Maasland / NL | 18.10.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.02.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.07.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M05) | 22.11.1990 | No. 03: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 30.11.1990 | No. 03: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 19.12.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 26.02.1992 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.09.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/44] | Appeal following opposition | 23.04.1992 | Appeal received No. T0379/92 | 24.06.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.07.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 07.07.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.1994 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4010714 (NOTSUKI IWAO, et al); | [A]GB2007486 (AKERMAN D E) | [A] - LANDTECHNIK, vol. 35, no. 5, May 1980, pages 222-224, Hannover, DE; D. ORDOLFF: "Melkzeuge automatisch ansetzen - demnächst Wirklichkeit" | [A] - LANDTECHNIK, vol. 37, no. 5, May 1982, pages 261-264, Lehrte, DE; R. ARTMANN et al.: "Technische Einrichtungen und erste Ergebnisse zur rechnergesteuerten Grund- und Kraftfuttervorlage" |