EP0094366 - Thermal energy storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1987 [1987/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167-7020 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/46] | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167-7020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Don Eugene 7 Williamsburg Road Creve Coeur Missouri 63141 / US | 02 /
Yuen, Henry Kwai-To 208 West Manor Drive Chesterfield Missouri 63017 / US | [1983/46] | Representative(s) | McLean, Peter, et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 B-1150 Brussels / BE | [1983/46] | Application number, filing date | 83870041.7 | 07.04.1983 | [1983/46] | Priority number, date | US19820366794 | 09.04.1982 Original published format: US 366794 | [1983/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094366 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094366 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/06 | [1983/46] | CPC: |
F28D20/02 (EP,US);
C09K5/063 (EP,US);
F24S90/00 (EP,US);
Y02E10/40 (EP,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP,US);
Y10S126/91 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1983/46] | Title | German: | System zur Speicherung von thermischer Energie | [1983/46] | English: | Thermal energy storage system | [1983/46] | French: | Système pour le stockage de l'énergie thermique | [1983/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/24] | 03.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.09.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2333862 (HILL LYLE O, et al); | [A]DE2524264 (BOECKMANN ALFRED); | [X]DE2746829 (BARRY WEHMILLER CO) |