EP0101427 - Polyblends of thermoplastic copolyetheresters styrene-maleic anhydride polymers and acrylonitrile-butadiene-styrene polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167-7020 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/08] | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167-7020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dufour, Daniel Louis Avenue de la Vallée 8 B-1410 Waterloo / BE | [1984/08] | Representative(s) | McLean, Peter, et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 B-1150 Brussels / BE | [1984/08] | Application number, filing date | 83870076.3 | 08.08.1983 | [1984/08] | Priority number, date | US19820406407 | 09.08.1982 Original published format: US 406407 | [1984/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0101427 | Date: | 22.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0101427 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101427 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/00, C08L35/06, C08L55/02 | [1984/08] | CPC: |
C08L67/025 (EP,US);
C08L35/06 (EP,US);
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L35/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L67/00, C08L35/06 (EP,US);
C08L67/00, C08L55/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/08] | Title | German: | Gemische aus thermoplastischen Copolyätherestern, aus Polymeren von Styrol und Maleinsäure-Anhydrid und ABS-Polymeren | [1984/08] | English: | Polyblends of thermoplastic copolyetheresters styrene-maleic anhydride polymers and acrylonitrile-butadiene-styrene polymers | [1984/08] | French: | Mélanges de copolyétheresters thermoplastiques, de polymères de styrène et d'anhydride maléique et de polymères ABS | [1984/08] | Examination procedure | 03.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 02.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4329272 (DUFOUR DANIEL L); | [A]GB2087903 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD, et al) |