EP0106832 - Heating apparatus convertible into a closed or open fire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONCEPT & FORME Sprl route d'Eghezée, 185B B-5852 Isnes / BE | [1984/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pitance, Gérard rue du Chef Lieu, 18 B-5670 Falisolle / BE | [1984/17] | Representative(s) | Dellicour, Paul Office Dellicour Avenue Rogier 19/13 B-4000 Liège / BE | [1984/17] | Application number, filing date | 83870110.0 | 19.10.1983 | [1984/17] | Priority number, date | BE19820894739 | 20.10.1982 Original published format: BE 894739 | [1984/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0106832 | Date: | 25.04.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0106832 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F24B1/18 | [1984/17] | CPC: |
F24B1/181 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/17] | Title | German: | Heizeinrichtung umwandelbar in eine Einrichtung mit geschlossener oder offener Feuerung | [1984/17] | English: | Heating apparatus convertible into a closed or open fire | [1984/17] | French: | Appareil de chauffage convertible en feu continu ou en feu ouvert | [1984/17] | File destroyed: | 10.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 18.12.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/26] | 17.01.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.10.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2168996 ; | [A]GB907989 ; | [A]US2241025 |