EP0110859 - Lid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.1985 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. THOVADEC PLASTICS S.A. Meerstraat, 55 B-9120 Destelbergen / BE | [1984/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Cuyper, Alex Meerstraat 79 B-9120 Destelbergen / BE | [1984/24] | Representative(s) | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 83870113.4 | 25.10.1983 | [1984/24] | Priority number, date | BE19820209337 | 26.10.1982 Original published format: BE 209337 | [1984/24] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0110859 | Date: | 13.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/06 | [1984/24] | CPC: |
B65D43/0256 (EP);
B65D2401/15 (EP);
B65D2543/00194 (EP);
B65D2543/00296 (EP);
B65D2543/00509 (EP);
B65D2543/00537 (EP);
B65D2543/00555 (EP);
B65D2543/00657 (EP);
B65D2543/00685 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1984/24] | Title | German: | Deckel | [1984/24] | English: | Lid | [1984/24] | French: | Couvercle | [1984/24] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 24.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/40] | 01.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2488222 [ ] (ORIOL JEAN [FR]); | FR2478588 [ ] (ORIOL JEAN [FR]); | FR2488220 [ ] (ORIOL JEAN [FR]); | FR2258316 [ ] (PERROT JEAN [FR]); | DE2549932 [ ] (THEYSOHN FRIEDRICH FA) |