EP0091426 - Production of alkoxyalkyl phosphate esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/41] | For all designated states FMC Corporation 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parsons, Norman Cole 138 Wodland Forest Winfield West Virginia 25213 / US | 02 /
Finley, Joseph Howard 65 Sharon Court Metuchen New Jersey 08840 / US | [1983/41] | Representative(s) | Pawloy, Heinrich, et al Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/41] | Pawloy, Heinrich, Dr., et al Riemergasse 14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 83890045.4 | 24.03.1983 | [1983/41] | Priority number, date | US19820366265 | 07.04.1982 Original published format: US 366265 | [1983/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0091426 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0091426 | Date: | 06.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/09 | [1983/41] | CPC: |
C07C41/18 (EP,US);
C07F9/091 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/18, C07C43/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/41] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Alkoxyalkylphosphorsäureestern | [1983/41] | English: | Production of alkoxyalkyl phosphate esters | [1983/41] | French: | Production d'esters alcoxyalkylphosphoriques | [1983/41] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 07.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/33] | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3681482 (PATEL VITHAL C, et al); | [Y]US3168569 (TORKEL MATELL PAUL MAGNUS); | [AD]US3020303 (PIANFETTI JOHN A, et al) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 26, 28th December 1981, page 103, no. 221706y, Columbus, OhioUS |