EP0127618 - PAPERBOARD EDGE BUFFER AND CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1985 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.1985 [1985/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOWARD, Paul Clifford Apartment 211 11841 Old River School Road Downey, CA 90241 / US | For all designated states NOWACZEK, Edward J. 318 Linden Drive Boulder, CO 80302 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | For all designated states HOWARD, Paul Clifford Apartment 211 11841 Old River School Road Downey, CA 90241 / US | ||
For all designated states NOWACZEK, Edward J. 318 Linden Drive Boulder, CO 80302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/50] | Application number, filing date | 83900148.4 | 29.11.1982 | [1984/50] | WO1982US01649 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8402066 | Date: | 07.06.1984 | [1984/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0127618 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/50] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A47L5/38 | [1984/50] | CPC: |
B65H37/00 (EP,US);
A47L13/40 (EP,US);
B26D7/018 (EP,US);
B26D7/088 (EP,US);
B26D7/18 (EP,US);
B31F7/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/50] | Title | German: | SCHLEIF- UND REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE KANTEN VON PAPPE | [1984/50] | English: | PAPERBOARD EDGE BUFFER AND CLEANER | [1984/50] | French: | POLISSEUSE ET NETTOYEUSE DE BORDS DE CARTON | [1984/50] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 31.10.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/25] | 21.12.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1985/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.08.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 30.08.1984 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 30.08.1984 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 30.08.1984 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 30.08.1984 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 30.08.1984 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 30.08.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 30.08.1984 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 30.08.1984 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1984 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3060482 (DOYLE DONALD J); | [A]US3135151 (LINK PETER J, et al); | [A]US3117333 (MURRAY THOMAS C, et al); | [A]US3272651 (QUIRK HARRISON P); | [A]US3601841 (CONRAD LUCAS J, et al); | [A]US3882568 (HILL GEORGE P) |