EP0101444 - THERAPEUTIC DEVICE FOR A HUMAN BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1987 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McGOWEN, Wayne H. 4930 Mill Creek Dallas, TX 75234 / US | [1984/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/09] | Representative(s) | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/09] | Geering, Keith Edwin, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 83900216.9 | 15.11.1982 | [1984/09] | WO1982US01613 | Priority number, date | US19820349451 | 17.02.1982 Original published format: US 349451 | [1984/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302889 | Date: | 01.09.1983 | [1983/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0101444 | Date: | 29.02.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00 | [1984/09] | CPC: |
A61H1/0218 (EP);
A61H2201/1642 (EP);
A61H2203/0493 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/09] | Title | German: | THERAPIEGERÄT FÜR DEN MENSCHLICHEN KÖRPER | [1984/09] | English: | THERAPEUTIC DEVICE FOR A HUMAN BODY | [1984/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF THERAPEUTIQUE POUR LE CORPS HUMAIN | [1984/09] | File destroyed: | 10.05.1993 | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1983 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.1983 | Search fee paid | 20.10.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/09] | 26.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2430223 ; | [Y]GB187437 ; | [A]DE3007835 | International search | [A]US4170988 (KRAUSE NICOLAAS J P R [ZA]); | [X]US3286708 (ROBERT GARTNER); | [X]US3568669 (STITES JOSEPH D); | [X]US4232662 (BARBER S MORGAN); | [A]US4190377 (PLEUSS MARK E [US]) |