EP0098287 - METHOD FOR MEASURING AND/OR CONTROLLING THE INTERFACIAL SURFACE TENSION OF LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.1987 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.1987 [1987/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALEXANDER, Martin Dr. Wilhelm-Kuhnert-Str. 24 D-8000 München 90 / DE | [1984/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/03] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Volkmar, et al Anwaltskanzlei Dr. Tetzner Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/03] | Tetzner, Volkmar, Dr.-Ing. Dr. jur., et al Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83900343.1 | 18.01.1983 | [1984/03] | WO1983EP00013 | Priority number, date | DE19823201410 | 19.01.1982 Original published format: DE 3201410 | [1984/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302500 | Date: | 21.07.1983 | [1983/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098287 | Date: | 18.01.1984 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0098287 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/27] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G01N13/02 | [1984/03] | CPC: |
G01N13/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG UND/ODER KONTROLLE DER OBERFLÄCHENSPANNUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [1984/03] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING AND/OR CONTROLLING THE INTERFACIAL SURFACE TENSION OF LIQUIDS | [1984/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE ET/OU DE CONTROLE DE LA TENSION SUPERFICIELLE DE LIQUIDES | [1984/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1983 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 25.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1071379 ; | [A]DE2836972 (BATTELLE INSTITUT E V) | [A] - Review of Scientific Instruments, Vol. 49, No. 10, October 1978, (New-York US) C.H. SOHL u.a.: "Novel Technique for Dynamic Surface Tension and Viscosity Measurements af Liquid-Gas Interfaces", see pages 1464-1463 |