EP0099396 - A METHOD OF CLEANING WATERY VENTILATING AIR CONTAINING LIQUIDS WHICH HAVE BEEN GASIFIED DURING COOLING OR LUBRICATION OF CONVERTING MACHINES, PARTICULARLY ROLLING MILLS, AND AN APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRÄNGES ALUMINIUM AKTIEBOLAG Box 1204 S-181 23 Lidingö / SE | [1984/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÄGSTRÖM, Per-Olof Kapellvägen 57 S-612 00 Finspang / SE | 02 /
ABRAHAMSSON, Lars Olof Kalkugnsvägen 10 A S-612 00 Finspang / SE | [1984/05] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83900583.2 | 28.01.1983 | [1984/05] | WO1983SE00030 | Priority number, date | SE19820000500 | 29.01.1982 Original published format: SE 8200500 | [1984/05] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302569 | Date: | 04.08.1983 | [1983/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0099396 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0099396 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/46] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B01D5/00, F24F3/14 | [1984/05] | CPC: |
B01D5/0036 (EP,US);
B01D5/009 (EP,US);
Y10S165/909 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/05] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR REINIGUNG VON WÄSSRIGEN, VENTILIERUNGSLUFT ENTHALTENDEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN, WELCHE WÄHREND DER KÜHLUNG ODER SCHMIERUNG VON KONVERTIERUNGSMASCHINEN, INSBESONDERE WALZWERKEN, VERGART WORDEN SIND, UND VORRICHTUNG DAZU | [1984/05] | English: | A METHOD OF CLEANING WATERY VENTILATING AIR CONTAINING LIQUIDS WHICH HAVE BEEN GASIFIED DURING COOLING OR LUBRICATION OF CONVERTING MACHINES, PARTICULARLY ROLLING MILLS, AND AN APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | [1984/05] | French: | PROCEDE D'EPURATION DE L'AIR HUMIDE DE VENTILATION CONTENANT DES LIQUIDES QUI ONT ETE GAZEIFIES PENDANT LE REFROIDISSEMENT OU LA LUBRIFICATION DE MACHINES DE CONVERSION, EN PARTICULIER DE LAMINOIRS ET APPAREIL DE MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE | [1984/05] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1983 | Translation filed | 16.09.1983 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1983 | Examination requested [1984/05] | 21.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 13.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.11.1986 | LU | 31.01.1987 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/16] | SE | 30.11.1986 | Cited in | International search | [A]SE143146 ; | [A]SE361181 (GRAENGES ENG AB) |