EP0101458 - SELF CLEANING FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIS IRRIGATION SYSTEMS PTY.LTD. Cnr Philip Highway and Hogarth Road Elizabeth, S.A. 5112 / AU | [1984/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUCKER, Alfred Denholm Kersbrook Post Office Kersbrook, S.A. 5231 / AU | [1984/09] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/09] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83900613.7 | 14.02.1983 | [1984/09] | WO1983AU00020 | Priority number, date | AU19820002687 | 12.02.1982 Original published format: AU 268782 | [1984/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302732 | Date: | 18.08.1983 | [1983/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0101458 | Date: | 29.02.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/09] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/16 | [1984/09] | CPC: |
B01D29/117 (EP);
B01D29/58 (EP);
B01D29/6415 (EP);
B01D29/682 (EP);
B01D2201/583 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1984/09] | Title | German: | SELBSTREINIGENDER FILTER | [1984/09] | English: | SELF CLEANING FILTER | [1984/09] | French: | FILTRE A AUTO-NETTOYAGE | [1984/09] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.1983 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.1983 | Search fee paid | 06.10.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/09] | 24.05.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AP]AU7727681 ; | [A]AU4187878 ; | [A]AU5313079 ; | [X]AU1388676 ; | [A]AU7190374 ; | [A]FR2183719 ; | [A]US3363759 ; | [A]US3056501 ; | [A]US2975899 | [A] - Plant Engineering, Volume 32, Part 12, issued 1978, June 8, (Barrington, ill.), J.I. SCHAEFFER, "Self Cleaning Filtration Systems", see pages 115-118. |