EP0105285 - DRAW-TEXTURED, BASIC DYEABLE POLYESTER YARN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/16] | DRAW-TEXTURED, BASE-DYEABLE POLYESTER YARN | ||
[1985/40] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.10.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhône-Poulenc Viscosuisse SA 6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states Rhône-Poulenc Viscosuisse SA CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | ||
Former [1984/16] | For all designated states VISCOSUISSE SA CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUMBRECHT, Rémy Eichenstrasse 22 CH-6015 Reussbühl / CH | 02 /
SCHMIEDER, Heinrich Benziwil 21 CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | [1984/16] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Peter Johannes Rhodia Industrial Yarns AG Patentabteilung MB 6021 Emmenbrücke / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/44] | Herrmann, Peter Johannes c/o Rhône-Poulenc Viscosuisse SA Patentabteilung IB CH-6021 Emmenbrücke / CH | ||
Former [1984/16] | Thomas, Alain c/o VISCOSUISSE SA Patentabteilung CH-6020 Emmenbrücke / CH | Application number, filing date | 83900833.1 | 16.03.1983 | [1984/16] | WO1983CH00035 | Priority number, date | CH19820001935 | 30.03.1982 Original published format: CH 193582 | [1984/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8303432 | Date: | 13.10.1983 | [1983/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0105285 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105285 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/40] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0105285 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/92, D01F6/84, C08L67/02, C08G63/68 | [1984/16] | CPC: |
D01F6/92 (EP,US);
C08G63/6886 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
D01F6/84 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L23/00 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L71/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1984/16] | Title | German: | STRECKTEXTURIERTER, BASISCH FÄRBBARER POLYESTERFADEN | [1984/16] | English: | DRAW-TEXTURED, BASIC DYEABLE POLYESTER YARN | [1985/40] | French: | FIL POLYESTER, TEXTURE A L'ETIRAGE, TEIGNABLE AVEC DES COLORANTS BASIQUES | [1985/40] |
Former [1984/16] | DRAW-TEXTURED, BASE-DYEABLE POLYESTER YARN | ||
Former [1984/16] | FIL EN POLYESTER, TEXTURE A L'ETIRAGE, COLORABLE AVEC DES BASES | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1983 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/23] | 08.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.06.1986
14.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Faser AG Fachbereich Patentwesen Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | 02
28.06.1986
14.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.06.1986
14.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE Akzo Faser AG Fachbereich Patentwesen Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | ||
02
28.06.1986
14.08.1986
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
Former [1986/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.06.1986
Enka AG Enka-Haus Kasinostrasse Postfach 10 01 49 D-42001 Wuppertal / DE | ||
02
28.06.1986
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentanbteilung Gebäude F 821 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 25.08.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.10.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.12.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.11.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.1990 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.03.1992 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.04.1992 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.06.1992 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.09.1992 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.05.1988 | Appeal received No. T0207/88 | 14.05.1988 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE1258545 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [Y]LU60722 ; | [X]US3725351 (HARRISON A, et al); | [X]US3745141 (PALSKY A, et al); | [Y]DE2458373 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [XP]FR2491479 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) |