EP0108812 - ANALOG/DIGITAL CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Miki Audio Technology Center Sony Corporation 7-4 Konan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Tadao Audio Technology Center Sony Corporation 7-4 Konan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Verdier, Louis, et al Cabinet Pierre HERRBURGER 115 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | Verdier, Louis, et al Cabinet Pierre HERRBURGER 115 Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83900968.5 | 25.03.1983 | [1984/21] | WO1983JP00090 | Priority number, date | JP19820047607 | 25.03.1982 Original published format: JP 4760782 | [1984/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8303501 | Date: | 13.10.1983 | [1983/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108812 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108812 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/52 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
H03M1/1225 (EP,KR,US);
H03M1/162 (EP,KR,US);
H03M1/52 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/21] | H03K13/02, H03K13/20 | Designated contracting states | FR [1984/21] | Title | German: | ANALOG/DIGITAL UMWANDLER | [1984/21] | English: | ANALOG/DIGITAL CONVERTER | [1984/21] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE/NUMERIQUE | [1984/21] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1983 | Translation filed | 21.11.1983 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1983 | Search fee paid | 21.11.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 11.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]JPS5868317 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS53137659 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) |