EP0101502 - HIGH RESOLUTION LIGHT PEN FOR USE WITH GRAPHIC DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states May, George A. R.R. 1 East Sooke Road Sooke British Columbia, VOS 1 NO / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1984/51] | For all designated states May, George A. R.R. 1 East Sooke Road Sooke British Columbia, VOS 1 NO / CA | ||
Former [1984/09] | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne Florida 32912 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/52] |
Former [1984/09] | 01 /
MAY, George A. R.R. 1, East Sooke Road Sooke British Columbia VOS 1 NO / CA | Representative(s) | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/09] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Keith W Nash & Co Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 83901012.1 | 07.02.1983 | [1984/09] | WO1983US00166 | Priority number, date | US19820346368 | 05.02.1982 Original published format: US 346368 | [1984/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302849 | Date: | 18.08.1983 | [1983/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0101502 | Date: | 29.02.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101502 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01J5/16, G06K7/10, H03K5/24 | [1984/09] | CPC: |
G06F3/03542 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/09] | Title | German: | LICHTFEDER HOHER AUFLÖSUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN GRAPHISCHEN DARSTELLUNGEN | [1984/09] | English: | HIGH RESOLUTION LIGHT PEN FOR USE WITH GRAPHIC DISPLAYS | [1984/09] | French: | PHOTOSTYLE A HAUTE RESOLUTION DESTINE A ETRE UTILISE AVEC DES AFFICHAGES GRAPHIQUES | [1984/09] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/17: Divisional application 88100915 filed on 22.01.88 | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.1983 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.1983 | Search fee paid | 03.10.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.1983 | Examination requested [1984/09] | 19.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88100915.3 / EP0306596 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.04.1990 | BE | 25.04.1990 | CH | 25.04.1990 | FR | 25.04.1990 | LI | 25.04.1990 | NL | 25.04.1990 | SE | 25.04.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1991/36] | AT | 25.04.1990 | |
BE | 25.04.1990 | ||
CH | 25.04.1990 | ||
LI | 25.04.1990 | ||
NL | 25.04.1990 | ||
SE | 25.04.1990 | ||
FR | 14.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/23] | AT | 25.04.1990 | |
BE | 25.04.1990 | ||
CH | 25.04.1990 | ||
LI | 25.04.1990 | ||
NL | 25.04.1990 | ||
SE | 25.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/17] | AT | 25.04.1990 | |
CH | 25.04.1990 | ||
LI | 25.04.1990 | ||
NL | 25.04.1990 | ||
SE | 25.04.1990 | ||
Former [1991/08] | CH | 25.04.1990 | |
LI | 25.04.1990 | ||
SE | 25.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/50] | SE | 25.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | FR2191143 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | International search | [Y]US3599003 (PRICE DONALD E, et al); | [A]US3497701 (DALTON JOHN J); | [A]US4053765 (KUFFER FERNAND BANNIE); | [A]US4109146 (HILLMAN GARTH DECKER); | [A]US3683284 (MUELLER PETER G); | [A]US4119797 (WOLLERT WALTER C) | Examination | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol.15, nr. 8, January 1973, pages 2522-2523; New York, US M.S. BILSBACK: "Lightpen". |