EP0105302 - IMPROVED SUPPORTS OF HEATING BODIES INTENDED TO ANNEALING FURNACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1987 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1987 [1987/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COCKERILL SAMBRE Société Anonyme dite: Avenue Adolphe Greiner, 1 B-4100 Liège (Seraing) / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | For all designated states COCKERILL SAMBRE Société Anonyme dite: Avenue Adolphe Greiner, 1 B-4100 Liege (Seraing) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROMBOUTS, André Henri Léon Rue de la Colline 97 B-4120 Ivoz-Ramet / BE | [1984/16] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel, et al p.a. FREYLINGER & ASSOCIES 85/042 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/16] | van Malderen, Michel, et al p.a. FREYLINGER & ASSOCIES 85/042 Boulevard de la Sauvenière B-4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 83901180.6 | 25.03.1983 | [1984/16] | WO1983BE00008 | Priority number, date | LU19820084040 | 26.03.1982 Original published format: LU 84040 | [1984/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8303428 | Date: | 13.10.1983 | [1983/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0105302 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0105302 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/00, F23C3/00, F23D23/00, F28F9/00 | [1984/16] | CPC: |
C21D9/0006 (EP,US);
F23C3/002 (EP,US);
F27D1/0036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/16] | Title | German: | STÜTZEN FÜR HEIZKÖRPER ZUM VERWENDEN BEI GLÜHÖFEN | [1984/16] | English: | IMPROVED SUPPORTS OF HEATING BODIES INTENDED TO ANNEALING FURNACES | [1984/16] | French: | SUPPORTS AMELIORES DE CORPS DE CHAUFFE DESTINES AUX FOURS DE RECUIT | [1984/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1983 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 07.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR861541 (ARMCO SA); | [A]GB487764 (SURFACE COMBUSTION CORP); | [A]GB1396796 (SKODA NP); | [A]US2204144 (MOORE WILLIAM T, et al); | [A]US2652037 (LEWIS ERNEST D, et al); | [A]US2822798 (IPSEN HAROLD N) | [A] - Gaz d'Aujourd'hui, Volume 98, No. 9, September 1974, Paris (FR) M. DOUSPIS: "Une Utilisation Rationnelle de l'Energie: le Tube Radiant a Gaz", pages 395-400 (cited in the application) |