EP0112863 - APPARATUS FOR SEPARATING FROM A BIOLOGICAL LIQUID, IN PARTICULAR BLOOD, A FRACTION HAVING MOLECULAR WEIGHT BETWEEN AN UPPER AND LOWER LIMITING VALUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOR-TRON A/S Postboks 575 N-3001 Drammen / NO | [1984/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMEBY, Leif Institutt for Biofysikk, N.T.H. N-7034 Trondheim / NO | 02 /
JORSTAD, Storker Institutt for Biofysikk, N.T.H. N-7034 Trondheim / NO | [1984/28] | Representative(s) | Topps, Ronald, et al D. YOUNG & CO 10 Staple Inn London WC1V 7RD / GB | [1984/28] | Application number, filing date | 83901946.0 | 23.06.1983 | [1984/28] | WO1983NO00025 | Priority number, date | NO19820002105 | 23.06.1982 Original published format: NO 822105 | [1984/28] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8400112 | Date: | 19.01.1984 | [1984/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0112863 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/03 | [1984/28] | CPC: |
A61M1/3472 (EP,US);
A61M1/3482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABTRENNUNG AUS EINER BIOLOGISCHEN FLÜSSIGKEIT WIE BLUT, EINER FRAKTION MIT EINEM ZWISCHEN EINEM OBEREN UND NIEDEREN BEGRENZUNGSWERT LIEGENDEN MOLEKÜLGEWICHT | [1984/28] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SEPARATING FROM A BIOLOGICAL LIQUID, IN PARTICULAR BLOOD, A FRACTION HAVING MOLECULAR WEIGHT BETWEEN AN UPPER AND LOWER LIMITING VALUE | [1984/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION A PARTIR D'UN LIQUIDE BIOLOGIQUE, NOTAMMENT DU SANG, UNE FRACTION POSSEDANT UN POIDS MOLECULAIRE COMPRIS ENTRE UNE VALEUR LIMITE SUPERIEURE ET UNE VALEUR LIMITE INFERIEURE | [1984/28] | File destroyed: | 10.12.1992 | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.1984 | Translation filed | 21.02.1984 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 21.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/14] | 31.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | NO144411 [ ]; | SE357073 [ ] (VIAK AB); | CH602120 [ ] (SARTORIUS MEMBRANFILTER GMBH); | DE2703188 [ ] (OELRICHS HEINER) |