EP0111530 - FIXING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIMIC, Borislav Fjäderharvsgatan 81 S-424 66 Angered / SE | [1984/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/26] | Representative(s) | Ryrlén, J. Evert, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 P.O. Box 11394 S-404 28 Göteborg / SE | [1987/15] |
Former [1986/12] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1984/26] | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 83901954.4 | 06.06.1983 | [1984/26] | WO1983SE00229 | Priority number, date | SE19820003517 | 07.06.1982 Original published format: SE 8203517 | [1984/26] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8304384 | Date: | 22.12.1983 | [1983/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0111530 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0111530 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B25B11/00, B23Q3/08 | [1984/26] | CPC: |
B25B11/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1984/26] | Title | German: | FIXIERVORRICHTUNG | [1984/26] | English: | FIXING DEVICE | [1984/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION | [1984/26] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1983 | Translation filed | 18.01.1984 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/26] | 15.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.09.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.04.1987 | BE | 22.04.1987 | CH | 22.04.1987 | LI | 22.04.1987 | LU | 30.06.1987 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/24] | AT | 22.04.1987 | |
BE | 22.04.1987 | ||
CH | 22.04.1987 | ||
LI | 22.04.1987 | ||
Former [1989/12] | AT | 22.04.1987 | |
BE | 22.04.1987 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 22.04.1987 | Cited in | International search | SU650776 [ ] (ZUBKOV VLADIMIR S [SU], et al); | DE2942876 [ ] (FORTUNE WILLIAM S); | DE3140882 [ ] (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) |