EP0110955 - BRAIN-SPECIFIC DRUG DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville Florida 32611-2037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA 223 Grinter Hall Gainesville, Florida 32611-2037 / US | ||
Former [1984/25] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF FLORIDA 207 Tigert Hall Gainesville, Florida 32611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODOR, Nicholas S. 7211 South West 97th Lane Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | [1984/25] | Representative(s) | Pendlebury, Anthony, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1984/25] | Application number, filing date | 83902034.4 | 12.05.1983 | [1984/25] | WO1983US00725 | Priority number, date | US19820379316 | 18.05.1982 Original published format: US 379316 | US19830461543 | 27.01.1983 Original published format: US 461543 | US19830475493 | 15.03.1983 Original published format: US 475493 | [1984/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8303968 | Date: | 24.11.1983 | [1983/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0110955 | Date: | 20.06.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0110955 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/22, C07D213/82, C07D213/80, C07D211/90, // C07J43/00 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
C07D213/80 (EP);
A61K47/559 (EP);
C07D209/32 (EP);
C07D211/90 (EP);
C07D213/82 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1984/25] | A61K9/22, C07D213/82, C07D213/80, C07D211/90, // C07C103/52, C07J43/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/25] | Title | German: | GEHIRNSPEZIFISCHE ARZNEIMITTELABGABE | [1984/25] | English: | BRAIN-SPECIFIC DRUG DELIVERY | [1984/25] | French: | ADMINISTRATION D'UN MEDICAMENT A ACTION SPECIFIQUE SUR LE CERVEAU | [1984/25] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/34: Divisional applications 86201714, 86201711, 86201713 filed on 03.10.86, divisional application 87201384 filed on 21.07.87 | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.1984 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/25] | 31.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 01.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP86201710.0 / EP0218300 | EP86201711.8 / EP0221588 | EP86201713.4 / EP0224283 | EP86201714.2 / EP0222425 | EP87201384.2 / EP0262696 | EP87201385.9 / EP0256577 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | AT BE CH DE FR GB LI LU NL SE | Licencee: | Pharmatec, Inc. P.O. Box 730 Alachua Florida 32615 / US | Date: | 28.07.1989 |
Former [1989/37] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | Pharmatec, Inc. P.O. Box 730 Alachua Florida 32615 / US | ||
Date: | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 23.08.1995 | SE | 23.11.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1996/14] | SE | 23.11.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3962447 (HIGUCHI TAKERU, et al) | [X] - Science, Vol. 214, No. 4527, published in 1981 (Washington D.C., US) N. BODOR et al.: "Site Specific, Sustained Release of Drugs to the Brain", pages 1370-1372, see the complete article | [X] - Journal of Pharmaceutical Sciences, Vol. 67, No. 5, published in May 1978 (Washington D.C., US) N. BODOR et al.: "Elimination of a Quaternary Pyridinium Salt, Delivered as its Dihydropyridine Derivative from Brain of Mice", pages 685-687, see the complete article | [A] - Chemical and Engineering News, published 21 December 1981 (Washington D.C., US) R. RAWLS: "New Methods let Drugs past Blood-Brain Barrier", pages 24, 25 | [XP] - Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, Vol. 26, published in April 1983 (Columbus, Ohio, US) N. BODOR: "Improved Delivery Through Biological Membranes. 13. Brain Specific Delivery of Dopamine with a Dihydropyridine - Pyridinium Salt Redox Type Delivery System", pages 528-534, see the complete article | [XP] - Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, Vol. 26, published in March 1983 (Columbus, Ohio, US) N. BODOR et al.: "Improved Delivery Through Biological Membranes. 11. A Redox Chemical Drug-Delivery System and its use for Brain-Specific Delivery of Phenekylamine", pages 313-317, see the complete article | Examination | - DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, VOL. VI, NO. 3, 1981, PAGES 165-182 | - OPTIMIZATION OF DRUG DELIVERY, ED. H. BUNDGAARD, A.B.HANSEN AND H. KOFOD, PUB. MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN, 1982, PAGES 157-177 | - DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS, ED. R.L.JULIANO, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, 1980, PAGES 112-176 | - CHEMISTRY AND INDUSTRY, 7TH JUNE, 1980, PAGES 441-443 | - DESIGN OF BIOPHARMACEUTICAL PROPERTIES THROUGH PRODRUGS AND ANALOGS, ED. E.B.ROCHE, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, 1977, PAGES 98-135 |