EP0118457 - FIRE SAFE PLUG VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAPOR CORPORATION 6420 W. Howard Street Chicago, IL 60648 / US | [1984/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDER, William H. 15235 Stradbrook Drive Houston, TX 77062 / US | 02 /
DARE, Roy, R. 15919 Baytree Street Houston, TX 77070 / US | [1984/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83902035.1 | 11.05.1983 | [1984/38] | WO1983US00726 | Priority number, date | US19820409430 | 19.08.1982 Original published format: US 409430 | [1984/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8400795 | Date: | 01.03.1984 | [1984/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118457 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118457 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16K41/00, F16K31/44 | [1987/33] | CPC: |
F16K41/046 (EP,US);
F16K5/0285 (EP,US);
Y10S277/91 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1797 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/38] | F16K31/44 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1984/38] | Title | German: | FEUERFESTES KÜKENVENTIL | [1984/38] | English: | FIRE SAFE PLUG VALVE | [1984/38] | French: | VANNE A CLEF A L'EPREUVE DU FEU | [1984/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.1984 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.1984 | Search fee paid | 19.04.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/38] | 29.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3157381 (JOHN FLOYD TERENCE); | [A]DE1230278 (ROCKWELL MFG CO) | International search | [Y]US3326516 (SACHNIK NORMAN H); | [Y]US3595585 (BRISTOW BARNEY C); | [A]US4245661 (MCGEE JOHN K); | [A]US4249555 (SCARAMUCCI DOMER [US]); | [Y]US4273148 (CHARLAND RAYMOND J); | [A]US4305567 (LUNT WILLIAM G); | [PT]US4379557 (SAKA HAMID J) |