EP0108804 - NON-DISPERSIVE INFRARED GAS ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.1989 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1989 [1989/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANDROS ANALYZERS INCORPORATED 2332 Fourth Street Berkeley California 94710 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | For all designated states ANDROS ANALYZERS INCORPORATED 2332 Fourth Street Berkeley California 94710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUROUGH, Irvin George 1656 Camino Verde Walnut Creek, CA 94596 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Kevin Graham 1280 Page Court Pinole, CA 94564 / US | [1984/21] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/21] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 83902049.2 | 12.05.1983 | [1984/21] | WO1983US00745 | Priority number, date | US19820380449 | 20.05.1982 Original published format: US 380449 | [1984/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8304097 | Date: | 24.11.1983 | [1983/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0108804 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108804 | Date: | 14.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/27, H03K5/153, H03K5/24 | [1984/21] | CPC: |
G01N21/274 (EP,US);
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G06J1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/21] | Title | German: | NICHTDISPERGIERENDES INFRAROTGASANALYSIERGERÄT | [1984/21] | English: | NON-DISPERSIVE INFRARED GAS ANALYZER | [1984/21] | French: | ANALYSEUR DE GAZ INFRAROUGE NON-DISPERSIF | [1984/21] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1983 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1983 | Search fee paid | 24.12.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 13.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4346296 (PASSARO ROBERT E, et al); | [A]US3887473 (STERNBERG STANLEY P, et al); | [A]US3004664 (DREYFUS MARC G); | [A]US4013260 (MCCLATCHIE EDWARD A, et al); | [A]US3953734 (DIMEFF JOHN); | [A]US3735273 (WRIGHT D, et al); | [A]US3800236 (RIETHMULLER L, et al); | [A]US4097860 (ARASEKI TAKASHI, et al); | [AP]US4374362 (SUTHERLAND GEORGE K, et al) | Examination | EP0046389 |