EP0116094 - METHOD FOR MEASURING ACID CONCENTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/34] | METHOD FOR MEASURING ACID OR ALKALI CONCENTRATION | ||
[1987/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.1988 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.1988 [1988/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/34] | For all designated states MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS, Inc. 2-5 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSHIBE, Minoru 3-16, Shinhinoodai, 1-chome Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-01 / JP | 02 /
HAMAMOTO, Toshiharu 210-30, Kurotori-cho Izumi-shi, Osaka 594 / JP | 03 /
YAMANO, Nobuyuki 8-953, Nishitoriishi 3-chome Takaishi-shi, Osaka 592 / JP | [1984/34] | Representative(s) | Lecca, Jean, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | [1984/34] | Application number, filing date | 83902450.2 | 02.08.1983 | [1984/34] | WO1983JP00251 | Priority number, date | JP19820133634 | 02.08.1982 Original published format: JP 13363482 | [1984/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8400612 | Date: | 16.02.1984 | [1984/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116094 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116094 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/06 | [1984/34] | CPC: |
G01N27/048 (EP);
G01N27/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1984/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON SÄUREKONZENTRATION | [1987/40] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING ACID CONCENTRATION | [1987/40] | French: | METHODE POUR MESURER LA CONCENTRATION D'ACIDE | [1987/40] |
Former [1984/34] | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON SÄURE- ODER ALKALIKONZENTRATION | ||
Former [1984/34] | METHOD FOR MEASURING ACID OR ALKALI CONCENTRATION | ||
Former [1984/34] | METHODE POUR MESURER LA CONCENTRATION D'ACIDE OU D'ALCALI | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.1984 | Translation filed | 14.03.1984 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.1984 | Search fee paid | 14.03.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 05.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS4513520B | [A] - THERALD MOELLER (Writer), "Inorganic Chemistry An Advanced Textbook" (1969) JOHN WILEY & Sons, Inc. (New York), p. 361-362 (See the Item of Anhydroussulfuric ACid) | Examination | DE1598255 |