EP0116580 - CONTAMINATION LEVEL INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.1988 [1988/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secretary of State for Trade and Industry in Her Britannic Majesty's Gov. of the U.K. of Great Britain and Northern Ireland 1/19 Victoria Street London SW1H OET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/48] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Trade and Industry in Her Britannic Majesty's Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland 1/19 Victoria Street London SW1H OET / GB | ||
Former [1984/35] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Industry in Her Britannic Majesty's Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland 1 Victoria Street London SW1H 0ET / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNT, Trevor, Maxwell 50 Kingsholm Road Westbury-on-Trym Bristol Avon / GB | 02 /
BOWNS, Desmond, Edward 17 Landsdown Crescent Bath Avon / GB | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Wildman, David Brian, et al British Aerospace Defence Limited Royal Ordnance Division Egyptian House 170-173 Piccadilly London W1V 9DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | Wildman, David Brian, et al British Aerospace Defence Limited Royal Ordnance Division Egyptian House 170-173 Piccadilly London W1V 9DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 83902533.5 | 04.08.1983 | [1984/35] | WO1983GB00194 | Priority number, date | GB19820023402 | 13.08.1982 Original published format: GB 8223402 | [1984/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8400816 | Date: | 01.03.1984 | [1984/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116580 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116580 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/06 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
G01N15/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/09] |
Former [1984/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | KONTAMINATIONSGRADANZEIGER | [1984/35] | English: | CONTAMINATION LEVEL INDICATOR | [1984/35] | French: | INDICATEUR DE NIVEAU DE CONTAMINATION | [1984/35] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1986/08: Verbunden mit 83304522.1/0101263 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 16.12.85 | EPB 1986/08: Consolidated with 83304522.2/0101263 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 16.12.85 | EPB 1986/08: Jointe à la demande no. 83304522.2/0101263 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 16.12.85 | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.1984 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/35] | 07.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3499315 (MARINO JOSEPH A); | [X]US3678881 (SHINN JEFFREY N); | [X]US3357236 (WALTER KASTEN); | [A]FR2102768 (ROSTOCK DIESELMOTOREN); | [A]US3893334 (WILLIAMS DAVID JOSEPH) | Examination | EP0035788 | US3452586 |