EP0115515 - DIFFRACTION OPTICS DIFFUSING SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.1988 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles California 90045-0066 / US | [1986/29] |
Former [1984/33] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNTHER, John, E. 21217 South Harvard Boulevard Torrance, CA 90501 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Ronald, T. 320 Paseo de la Playa E Redondo Beach, CA 90277 / US | [1984/33] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83902563.2 | 22.07.1983 | [1984/33] | WO1983US01140 | Priority number, date | US19820403945 | 30.07.1982 Original published format: US 403945 | [1984/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8400616 | Date: | 16.02.1984 | [1984/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0115515 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0115515 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/32 | [1984/33] | CPC: |
G02B5/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1984/33] | Title | German: | STREUSCHIRM MIT BEUGENDER OPTIK | [1984/33] | English: | DIFFRACTION OPTICS DIFFUSING SCREEN | [1984/33] | French: | ECRAN DIFFUSEUR A OPTIQUE DE DIFFRACTION | [1984/33] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.1984 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/33] | 31.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3907403 (MAEDA HARUO); | [A]GB1579214 (CENTRAL ELECTR GENERAT BOARD, et al) | [A] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 23, No. 2, issued July 1980 (New York, US) G.T. SINCERBOX et al. "System to Increase the Efficiency of the Holographic Energy Distribution for Individual Chip Replacement", see pages 831 and 832 |