EP0116591 - MULTIPROCESSOR SYSTEM FOR HANDLING INTERPROCESSOR CALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/35] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING INTERPROCESSOR CALLS IN A MULTIPROCESSOR SYSTEM | ||
[1987/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.1988 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, NY 10038 / US | [1984/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DeBRULER, Dennis, L. 4720 Main Street Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Weitzel, David Stanley, et al Western Electric Company Limited Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | Weitzel, David Stanley, et al Western Electric Company Limited 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 83902652.3 | 28.03.1983 | [1984/35] | WO1983US00435 | Priority number, date | US19820411899 | 26.08.1982 Original published format: US 411899 | [1984/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401043 | Date: | 15.03.1984 | [1984/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116591 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116591 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F9/46 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
G06F12/0284 (EP,US);
G06F12/0292 (EP,US);
G06F15/161 (EP,US);
G06F15/173 (EP,US);
G06F9/544 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1984/35] | Title | German: | MULTIPROZESSORSYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANRUFEN ZWISCHEN PROZESSOREN | [1987/30] | English: | MULTIPROCESSOR SYSTEM FOR HANDLING INTERPROCESSOR CALLS | [1987/30] | French: | SYSTEME A MULTIPROCESSEURS PERMETTANT D'ASSURER L'ECOULEMENT DU TRAFIC D'APPEL ENTRE PROCESSEURS | [1987/30] |
Former [1984/35] | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANRUFEN ZWISCHEN PROZESSOREN IN EINEM MULTIPROZESSORSYSTEM | ||
Former [1984/35] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING INTERPROCESSOR CALLS IN A MULTIPROCESSOR SYSTEM | ||
Former [1984/35] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ASSURER L'ECOULEMENT DU TRAFIC D'APPEL ENTRE PROCESSEURS DANS UN SYSTEME A MULTIPROCESSEURS | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.1984 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/43] | 13.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3643227 (SMITH WILLIAM R, et al); | [Y]GB1170587 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [Y] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 22, No. 5, October 1979 (New York, US) LAKE et al.: "Loosely Coupled Multiprocess Model Applied to a line Switching Architecture", pages 1918-1923, see page 1918, lines 1,2, 10-20; the figure; page 1919, lines 1,2,11-16; page 1921, lines 1-4, 12-22 | [Y] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 24, No. 2, July 1981 (New York, US) LORIE et al.: "Multiprocessor System for Executing Concurrent Sequential Processes with Shared Variables", pages 1019-1020, see page 1019; page 1020, lines 1-16 | [A] - American Federation of Information Processing Society Proceedings of the National Computer Conference; Dallas, 13-16 June 1977, A.F.I.P.S. Joint Computer Conference. 1977, Vol. 46 (Montvale, US) SWAN et al.: "The Implementation of the Cm Multi-Microprocessor", pages 645-655 | Examination | - Giloi, "Rechnerarchitektur", 1981, pp. 282-286, 308-320, 328-329 |