EP0118480 - RECOMPRESSION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1988 [1988/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FFA FLUG- UND FAHRZEUGWERKE AG CH-9423 Altenrhein / CH | [1984/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRÜNINGER, Edgar Brunnenackerstrasse 1 CH-9422 Staad / CH | [1984/38] | Representative(s) | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy Pauline, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/38] | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy P., Dipl.-Chem., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 83902690.3 | 01.09.1983 | [1984/38] | WO1983CH00100 | Priority number, date | CH19820005258 | 03.09.1982 Original published format: CH 525882 | [1984/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8400982 | Date: | 15.03.1984 | [1984/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118480 | Date: | 19.09.1984 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118480 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/49] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/24 | [1984/38] | CPC: |
C25D11/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/38] | Title | German: | NACHVERDICHTUNGSVERFAHREN | [1984/38] | English: | RECOMPRESSION PROCESS | [1984/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECOMPRESSION | [1984/38] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1984 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/38] | 08.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP54116350 ; | [A]US3071494 (HUMPHREYS VICTOR T); | [A]US3494839 (CHAMBERS BRYCE, et al); | [A]US4103048 (ALEXANDER ANDREW) | [A] - Metal Finishing Abstracts, Vol. 22, No. 4, July/August 1980, Hampton Hill (GB), see page 269D, left-hand column & JP, A, 54116350 (Nippon Senka K.K.) 02 March 1978 (02.03.78), & JP54116350 A 19780302 | Examination | EP0101820 |