EP0115532 - IMMUNOASSAY APPARATUS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.1985 [1985/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Block, Myron J. 334 North Main Street North Salem New Hampshire 03073 / US | For all designated states HIRSCHFELD, Tomas B. 1262 Vancouver Way Livermore CA 94550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/33] | For all designated states Block, Myron J. 334 North Main Street North Salem New Hampshire 03073 / US | ||
For all designated states HIRSCHFELD, Tomas B. 1262 Vancouver Way Livermore CA 94550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1984/33] | Application number, filing date | 83902737.2 | 09.08.1983 | [1984/33] | WO1983US01230 | Priority number, date | US19820406324 | 09.08.1982 Original published format: US 406324 | [1984/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8400817 | Date: | 01.03.1984 | [1984/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0115532 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/33] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/00, G01N21/64, G01N33/54, G01N33/58 | [1984/33] | CPC: |
G01N21/648 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N21/7703 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7786 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/33] | Title | German: | IMMUNOLOGISCHE TESTVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [1984/33] | English: | IMMUNOASSAY APPARATUS AND METHODS | [1984/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDES D'ANALYSE IMMUNOLOGIQUE | [1984/33] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 10.07.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/04] | 08.08.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1985/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.05.1984 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 09.05.1984 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 09.05.1984 | GB   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3604927 (HIRSCHFELD TOMAS); | [Y]US3939350 (KRONICK MELVYN N, et al); | [Y]US3998591 (ECKFELDT EDGAR LAWRENCE); | [Y]US4050895 (HARDY EDGAR E, et al); | [A]US4106909 (DAVID DONALD J, et al); | [A]US4133639 (HARTE RICHARD A); | [A]US4321057 (BUCKLES RICHARD G); | [AP]US4368047 (ANDRADE JOSEPH D, et al); | [AT]US4399099 (BUCKLES RICHARD G [US]); | [XP]EP0075353 |