EP0102391 - DUAL MICROCAPSULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.1984 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 505 King Avenue Columbus Ohio 43201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/11] | For all designated states BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 505 King Avenue Columbus Ohio 43201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARDNER, David L. RD. no. 3, Rule Road Bellville, OH 44813 / US | [1984/11] | Application number, filing date | 83902796.8 | 02.03.1983 | [1984/11] | WO1983US00285 | Priority number, date | US19820354869 | 04.03.1982 Original published format: US 354869 | [1984/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8303061 | Date: | 15.09.1983 | [1983/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0102391 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/11] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/02, B01D13/04, A01N25/28, A01N63/02, A61J3/07, A61K9/52, A61K9/54, A61K9/62, A61K37/48 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
A61K9/5073 (EP);
A01N25/28 (EP);
B01J13/025 (EP);
B01J13/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/11] | Title | German: | DOPPELWANDIGE MIKROKAPSELN | [1984/11] | English: | DUAL MICROCAPSULES | [1984/11] | French: | MICROCAPSULES DOUBLES | [1984/11] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 07.02.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/35] | 08.03.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1984/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.12.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 05.12.1983 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 05.12.1983 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 05.12.1983 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 05.12.1983 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 05.12.1983 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 05.12.1983 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 05.12.1983 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 05.12.1983 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.03.1984 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4111201 ; | [X]US3493652 ; | [A]US3429827 ; | [A]US3773919 ; | [A]US4016099 |