EP0120047 - RELEASABLE LOCKING, COUPLING OR SUPPORT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/40] | RELEASABLE LOCKING COUPLING OR SUPPORT DEVICE | ||
[1987/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1988 [1988/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LATCHWAYS LIMITED St. Martin's House 140 Tottenham Court Road London W1P 9LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states LATCHWAYS LIMITED St. Martin's House 140 Tottenham Court Road London W1P 9LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUPPER, Alan, William The Weavers House Castle Combe Wiltshire SN14 7HX / GB | 02 /
FLUX, Peter, Robert Latchway Development Office 5 Waterside Castle Combe Wiltshire SN14 7HX / GB | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 83903001.2 | 20.09.1983 | [1984/40] | WO1983GB00230 | Priority number, date | GB19820027660 | 28.09.1982 Original published format: GB 8227660 | GB19830004044 | 14.02.1983 Original published format: GB 8304044 | [1984/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401414 | Date: | 12.04.1984 | [1984/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120047 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120047 | Date: | 08.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/15] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/10, E05C17/08, B63B21/00 | [1987/15] | CPC: |
E05C17/085 (EP,US);
B63H9/10 (EP,US);
F16B1/00 (EP,US);
F16B13/08 (EP,US);
F16B21/10 (EP,US);
F16B7/105 (EP,US);
F16G11/10 (EP,US);
Y10T24/38 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45497 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45508 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45675 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32434 (EP,US);
Y10T403/608 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1984/40] | F16G11/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL, SE [1984/40] | Title | German: | LÖSBARE SCHLIESS-, KUPPLUNGS- ODER STÜTZEINHEIT | [1984/40] | English: | RELEASABLE LOCKING, COUPLING OR SUPPORT DEVICE | [1987/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT, DE COUPLAGE OU DE VERROUILLAGE LIBERABLE | [1984/40] |
Former [1984/40] | RELEASABLE LOCKING COUPLING OR SUPPORT DEVICE | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1984 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/40] | 31.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.11.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0007084 (VOSS GUNTER MEINHARDT); | [A]EP0013693 (PAL DI DONA ALESSANDRO & C S N [IT]); | [A]CH399843 ; | [A]CH208803 (GRANDJEAN CHARLES JUN [CH]); | [A]DE654181 (PAUL WIESINGER); | [A]GB1560491 (PETZL P); | [A]GB1077068 (BARROW HEPBURN & GALE LTD); | [A]US3793682 (NELSON R); | [A]FR2101774 (KLEPPER INTERNATIONAL AG); | [A]FR1600191 | Examination | FR2057079 | GB1121087 |