EP0119249 - HIGH-SPEED SCHOTTKY TTL GATE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Stanley 2147 McClellan Road Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | Wright, Hugh Ronald, et al Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 83903068.1 | 09.09.1983 | [1984/39] | WO1983US01380 | Priority number, date | US19820416450 | 10.09.1982 Original published format: US 416450 | [1984/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401066 | Date: | 15.03.1984 | [1984/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0119249 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.1984 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1984/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0119249 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/088, H03K19/092, H03K17/04, H03K19/013 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
H03K19/013 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITS-SCHOTTKY-TTL TORVORRICHTUNG | [1984/39] | English: | HIGH-SPEED SCHOTTKY TTL GATE APPARATUS | [1984/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF A PORTE TTL SCHOTTKY A HAUTE VITESSE | [1984/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.1984 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.1984 | Search fee paid | 10.04.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/39] | 10.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4081695 (ALLEN GORDON HADFIELD, et al); | [Y]EP0026051 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | International search | [X]JPS5625831 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]US3958136 (SCHROEDER PAUL ROBERT); | [A]US3971961 (INAMI MAMORU, et al); | [A]US4255670 (GRIFFITH PAUL J); | [A]JPS55163918 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) | [A] - National (Product Catalog), issued October 1975, see figure 16, page 8-35. |