EP0120975 - NUMERICAL CONTROLLING DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Mitsuo 1-12-17, Higashi Nakano Nakano-ku Tokyo 164 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Teruyuki 38-8, Matsugaya Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-03 / JP | 03 /
YUKUTOMO, Masashi 1-10-5, Nishi Hashimoto Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 229 / JP | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83903201.8 | 07.10.1983 | [1984/41] | WO1983JP00333 | Priority number, date | JP19820177108 | 08.10.1982 Original published format: JP 17710882 | [1984/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401631 | Date: | 26.04.1984 | [1984/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120975 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120975 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/18, G06F9/06 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
G05B19/406 (EP);
G05B2219/35262 (EP);
G05B2219/36542 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1984/41] | Title | German: | NUMERISCHE STEUERVORRICHTUNG | [1984/41] | English: | NUMERICAL CONTROLLING DEVICE AND METHOD | [1984/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE NUMERIQUE | [1984/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.1984 | Translation filed | 25.06.1984 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.1984 | Search fee paid | 25.06.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/41] | 05.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0067875 ; | [XE]EP0092977 | International search | [Y]JPS56153462 ; | [Y]JPS5486887 | Examination | EP0027317 | EP0078326 | - TRS-80 Model II, Operation Manual, 1979, Radio Schack, Tandy Corporation, Fort Worth, Texas 76102, U.S.A. |