EP0122941 - GRAPHIC DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1989 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Yoshiaki 2308-1, Kobiki-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | [1984/44] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/44] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83903211.7 | 14.10.1983 | [1984/44] | WO1983JP00347 | Priority number, date | JP19820181596 | 16.10.1982 Original published format: JP 18159682 | [1984/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401634 | Date: | 26.04.1984 | [1984/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0122941 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G05B19/405 | [1984/44] | CPC: |
G05B19/4069 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/44] | Title | German: | GRAPHISCHE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [1984/44] | English: | GRAPHIC DISPLAY APPARATUS | [1984/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE GRAPHIQUE | [1984/44] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.1984 | Translation filed | 02.07.1984 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1984 | Search fee paid | 02.07.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 30.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/06] | 08.09.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PROCEEDINGS OF 19TH ANNUAL MEETING AND TECHNICAL CONFERENCE, NUMERICAL CONTROL SOCIETY, 18th-21st April 1982, Dearborn, Michigan, pages 239-254, Numerical Control Society, Glenview, US; R. FRIDSHAL et al.: "Geometric modeling based numerical control part program verification" | International search | [A]JPS5532114 (FUJITSU FANUC LTD); | [A]JPS5537250 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al); | [A]JPS57143612 (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD) |